Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:06:27 (UTC).

JOSE LOPEZ ET AL VS JENNY YOON ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 JOSE LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNY YOON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0239

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOPEZ ISABEL

LOPEZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

YOON JENNY

LEE MOON SOO

LEE JENNY

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LERMAN STEVEN A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SCHENKMAN MARK A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/6/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JENNY YOON AND MOON SOO LEE

12/6/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JENNY YOON AND MOON SOO LEE

Unknown

12/6/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/6/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/8/2017: CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/8/2017: CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/18/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JENNY YOON AND MOON SOO LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by JENNY YOON (Defendant); JENNY LEE (Legacy Party); MOON SOO LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOSE LOPEZ (Plaintiff); ISABEL LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOSE LOPEZ (Plaintiff); ISABEL LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOSE LOPEZ (Plaintiff); ISABEL LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JOSE LOPEZ (Plaintiff); ISABEL LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHENKMAN MARK A. ESQ.