This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 20:14:15 (UTC).

JOSE L. NAZAR VS PETER VINCER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 JOSE L NAZAR filed an Other lawsuit against PETER VINCER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6412

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAZAR JOSE L.

Defendants

VINCER PETER

VINCER DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REEDER CHRISTOPHER S

TRAGISH BENJAMIN SWENSON

YADEGARI MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SHERMAN LEE ALAN

HY RANDY

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

1/18/2022: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

1/18/2022: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Default Judgment

1/19/2022: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT...)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT...)

Substitution of Attorney

12/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE CALL RE (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT;)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE CALL RE (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT;)

Statement of the Case

10/12/2021: Statement of the Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/12/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Writ - Return

9/29/2021: Writ - Return

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

7/14/2021: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF POSSESSION

7/26/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF POSSESSION

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

8/2/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION AND FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR AND SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON DEFE

8/2/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION AND FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR AND SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON DEFE

Association of Attorney

8/3/2021: Association of Attorney

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Entry of Default...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Danielle Vincer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Peter Vincer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Conference (Call Re (Proposed) Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Conference Call Re (Proposed) Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 3:24 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Peter Vincer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Danielle Vincer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE L. NAZAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAGISH BENJAMIN SWENSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADEGARI MICHAEL MORDECHAI