Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 20:51:29 (UTC).

JOSE JOEL AGUILAR, ET AL. VS 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 JOSE JOEL AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8573

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR JOSE JOEL

AGUILAR LUIS

AGUILAR HERMINIA

AGUILAR ALVARO

Defendant

1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

6/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alvaro Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE JOEL AGUILAR (Plaintiff); LUIS AGUILAR (Plaintiff); Herminia Aguilar (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOSE JOEL AGUILAR (Plaintiff); LUIS AGUILAR (Plaintiff); Herminia Aguilar (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE JOEL AGUILAR (Plaintiff); LUIS AGUILAR (Plaintiff); Herminia Aguilar (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O