This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 07:11:10 (UTC).

JOSE HERNANDEZ ET AL VS WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 JOSE HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1614

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ GEORGINA

HERNANDEZ ALMA

HERNANDEZ JUAN

HERNANDEZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA

ADVENTIST HEALTH

KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE

WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

PROMISE HOSPITAL OF EAST LOS ANGELES

CHUNG M.D. NATHAN

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER

ZAPATA M.D. MARTIN

PROMISE HEALTHCARE

ST. JOSEPH HEALTH

BANSAL MD NANEESH A.

DOES 1-500

VERITY HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SARAJIAN ALEX ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BROBECK WEST BORGES ROSA & DOUVILLE LLC

DUMMIT CRAIG S. ESQ.

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F. ESQ.

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP

RYAN RICHARD J. ESQ.

BRADFORD THOMAS R. ESQ.

SCHMID & VOILES

HESTER CECILLE L. ESQ.

PAPPAS LOUIS W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund / Order - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER - GRANTED ($435)

12/21/2018: Request for Refund / Order - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER - GRANTED ($435)

Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH AND STAY PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OF JOSEPH L. LANDENWICH BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

12/24/2018: Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH AND STAY PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OF JOSEPH L. LANDENWICH BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

Motion for Protective Order - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE NOTICE BY PLAINTIFFS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR ATTORN

12/24/2018: Motion for Protective Order - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE NOTICE BY PLAINTIFFS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR ATTORN

Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH AND STAY PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OF BENJAMIN BREIER BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

12/24/2018: Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH AND STAY PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OF BENJAMIN BREIER BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN SPECIALTY CARE, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF MARTIN ZAPATA, D.O. TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/7/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF MARTIN ZAPATA, D.O. TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, D.O. TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/7/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, D.O. TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS

2/13/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. ELDER ABUSE- WELFARE AND

2/13/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. ELDER ABUSE- WELFARE AND

RULING RE: DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

2/15/2018: RULING RE: DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/15/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order -

2/15/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT MARTIN ZAPATA, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

3/6/2018: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER AND ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC.

3/6/2018: DEFENDANTS WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER AND ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC.

THIRD AMENDED COMPLATNT 1. ELDER ABUSE WELFARE AND

3/7/2018: THIRD AMENDED COMPLATNT 1. ELDER ABUSE WELFARE AND

SUMMONS -

3/7/2018: SUMMONS -

THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

3/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

395 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Hernandez (Plaintiff); Juan Hernandez (Plaintiff); Alma Hernandez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Juan Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS NEAL HANDEL, M.D., F.A.C.S. BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, INC. dba KINDRED HOSPITAL ? LA MIRADA) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON A NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application); Filed by M.D., Nathan Chung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
751 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Hernandez (Plaintiff); Juan Hernandez (Plaintiff); Alma Hernandez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA is a litigant

Latest cases where Promise Healthcare Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JUDE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Joseph Health is a litigant