This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 00:46:20 (UTC).

JOSE GUERRERO VS SEAFOOD VILLAGE INC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 JOSE GUERRERO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SEAFOOD VILLAGE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3280

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUERRERO JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

SEAFOOD VILLAGE INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

TAM LOY

CAO HAOQUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ARIE EBRAHIMIAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LIN VINCENT Y. ESQ.

BIRNDORF DEBORAH F.

LIN VINCENT Y.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEAFOOD VILLAGE, INC. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO

8/2/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEAFOOD VILLAGE, INC. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/3/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

8/6/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

12/28/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/14/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

5/24/2019: Declaration

Opposition

5/24/2019: Opposition

Reply

5/31/2019: Reply

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/7/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/22/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PLAINTIFF JOSE GUERRERO'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES ;ETC

2/7/2018: PLAINTIFF JOSE GUERRERO'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES ;ETC

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order (RULING); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Reply ( TO DEFENDANT SEAFOOD VILLAGE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES); Filed by Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two); Filed by Seafood Village, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Declaration (In Support of Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two); Filed by Seafood Village, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 3:01 PM in Department 49; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((1) Status Conference 2) Order to Show Cause 3) Further Case M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Seafood Village, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • PLAINTIFF JOSE GUERRERO'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693280    Hearing Date: August 11, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Jose Guerrero,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

BC693280

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Seafood Village, Inc., et al.

Defendants.

Hearing Date: August 11, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

1. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Moving Party:  Law Offices of Deborah F. Birndorf, APC

Responding Party:      none

Ruling: Birndorf’s motion to be relieved as counsel is granted.    

Law Offices of Deborah F. Birndorf, APC, counsel of record for defendants Seafood Village, Inc., Loy Sing Tam, and Haoquan Cao, has fulfilled the requirements set forth in California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The motion to be relieved as counsel is granted. The proposed order will be signed and filed forthwith. Birndorf is ordered to give notice of this ruling and serve her former client with a copy of the order.

Date: August 11, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIN VINCENT