This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 01:18:44 (UTC).

JOSE GABINO JIMENEZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 JOSE GABINO JIMENEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2349

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ JOSE GABINO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBSON KEVIN

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA JESSE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/20/2022: Case Management Statement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Gabino Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON KEVIN