This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 08:47:29 (UTC).

JOSE G VILLAGRANA VS SCOTTYS GAS STATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 JOSE G VILLAGRANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCOTTYS GAS STATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5007

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLAGRANA JOSE G.

Defendants and Respondents

SCOTTY'S GAS STATION

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BECKER TODD B. ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd B. Becker

3750 E. Anaheim Street, Suite 100

Long Beach, CA 90804

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MILLER LAW ASSOCIATES APC

MAYER ZACHARY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

1/17/2020: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON BOYER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TERMINATING SANCTIONS

1/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON BOYER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON BOYER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL - SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

1/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON BOYER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL - SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL - SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

1/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL - SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TERMINATING SANCTIONS

1/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

12/13/2019: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/10/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER {PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES} PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8/7/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER {PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES} PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT SCOTTY'S GAS, INC/S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/12/2019: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT SCOTTY'S GAS, INC/S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

7/12/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/2/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

12/6/2018: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

Declaration - Declaration OF ZACHARY MAYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, EVIDENTIARY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

2/27/2019: Declaration - Declaration OF ZACHARY MAYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, EVIDENTIARY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

DFFENDANT?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/14/2018: DFFENDANT?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose G. Villagrana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Court Order); Filed by Jose G. Villagrana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Defendant?s Motion for Order Deeming Admitted the Truth of Matter?s Specified in RFAs, Set 3; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or His Counsel.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Change Of Address, Telephone Number And Fax Number; Filed by Jose G. Villagrana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDFFENDANT S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Scotty's Gas Station (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Scotty's Gas Station (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose G. Villagrana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose G. Villagrana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695007    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

On February 23, 2018, Plaintiff Jose G. Villagrana (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Scotty’s Gas Station (“Defendant”). On June 10, 2019, Defendant served Plaintiff with Request for Supplemental Responses to Previously Served Form and Special Interrogatories, Request for Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production, and Special Interrogatories (Set Three). Plaintiff did not serve responses by the July 15, 2019 deadline. On August 12, 2019, defense counsel emailed Plaintiff’s counsel about the responses. Defense counsel followed up on August 22 and 29, 2019 seeking responses. Plaintiff did not serve responses or respond to the attempts to meet and confer. Defendant seeks to compel Plaintiff’s responses to discovery and monetary sanctions.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).) Unlike a motion to compel further responses, a motion to compel responses is not subject to a 45-day time limit and the propounding party has no meet and confer obligations. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at p. 404.)

Plaintiff filed no opposition to these Motions and did not serve responses to Defendant’s requests for discovery. Accordingly, the Motions to compel Plaintiff’s responses are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objection, to Defendant’s Request for Supplemental Responses to Previously Served Form and Special Interrogatories, Request for Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production, and Special Interrogatories (Set Three) within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Where the court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) Defendant’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the reduced amount of $810 for three hours at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $210 and $180 in filing fees, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.