This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 01:01:16 (UTC).

JOSE FERNANDO CRUZ VS MNZ JANITORIAL SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 JOSE FERNANDO CRUZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MNZ JANITORIAL SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9630

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ JOSE FERNANDO

Defendants

MNZ JANITORIAL SERVICES INC.

MNZ JANITORIAL SERVICES INC..

BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIMONJYAN RUBEN

SINGER RAINA

TURNER TANGANICA

Defendant Attorneys

MARCA MATTHEW DAVID

MICHAELS CONNIE L.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2018: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

2/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER LOS ANGELES MODEL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION

9/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER LOS ANGELES MODEL STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABIITY

8/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABIITY

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/18/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/20/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

6/27/2019: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/2/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

6/7/2019: Case Management Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/7/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Case Management Statement

5/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -2ND

5/28/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -2ND

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

5/20/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/3/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Los Angeles Model Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation); Filed by Beats Electronics, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailabiity); Filed by MNZ Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by MNZ Janitorial Services, Inc.. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Beats Electronics, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint (2nd); Filed by Jose Fernando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beats Electronics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCA MATTHEW D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAELS CONNIE LEE