Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:44:25 (UTC).

JOSE FELIX DEL CID PARRAS ET AL VS LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE ET A

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 JOSE FELIX DEL CID PARRAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7681

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PARRAS JOSE FELIX DEL CID

CID MARYLINN DEL

CID FELIX JOE DEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE

VENCES JOSE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AKIVA NIAMEHR LLP

DAVIDSON LAURA LYNN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TYSON & MENDES LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

3/27/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Stipulation and Order

2/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/27/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/27/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/28/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/28/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDKNTS LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE AND JOSE VENCES'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS JOSE FELIX DEL CID PARRAS, FELIX JOE DEL CID, AND MARYLINN DEL CID

1/5/2018: DEFENDKNTS LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE AND JOSE VENCES'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS JOSE FELIX DEL CID PARRAS, FELIX JOE DEL CID, AND MARYLINN DEL CID

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/5/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/5/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/27/2017: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

9/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Unknown

9/27/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

9/27/2017: SUMMONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff); Felix Joe Del Cid (Plaintiff); Marylinn Del Cid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Laura Lynn Davidson (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff); Felix Joe Del Cid (Plaintiff); Marylinn Del Cid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Laura Lynn Davidson (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) 1st stip & order to continue 6 mos. No further cont. by stip & order.); Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by LA Specialty Produce (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DEFENDKNTS LA SPECIALTY PRODUCE AND JOSE VENCES'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS JOSE FELIX DEL CID PARRAS, FELIX JOE DEL CID, AND MARYLINN DEL CID

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by LA Specialty Produce (Defendant); Jose M. Vences (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff); Felix Joe Del Cid (Plaintiff); Marylinn Del Cid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff); Felix Joe Del Cid (Plaintiff); Marylinn Del Cid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (Plaintiff); Felix Joe Del Cid (Plaintiff); Marylinn Del Cid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC677681    Hearing Date: December 15, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On September 27, 2017, Plaintiffs Jose Felix Del Cid Parras, Felix Joe Del Cid, and Marylinn Del Cid filed a complaint against Defendants LA Specialty Produce and Jose M. Vences alleging negligence, negligence per se, and statutory liability in the complaint arising from an automobile collision that occurred on October 9, 2015.

On August 13, 2020, Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid.

On December 1, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras petition to December 9, 2020.

On December 9, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras petition to December 15, 2020.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is scheduled for March 19, 2021.

PARTYS REQUEST

Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimant’s attendance are not required due to Claimant’s age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

On December 1, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parraspetition to December 9, 2020 so Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras could file amended petitioning papers amending the request for attorney’s fees.  Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras did not file amended petitioning papers before the December 9, 2020 hearing.  On December 9, 2020, the Court continued the hearing to December 15, 2020 to give Petitioner another chance to file the amended petitioning papers.  However, Petitioner has failed to do so.  No amended petitioning papers have been filed fixing the deficiencies highlighted in the December 1, 2020 order.  As such, the Court finds the petition must be denied.

CONCLUSION

The petition is DENIED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

Case Number: BC677681    Hearing Date: December 09, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On September 27, 2017, Plaintiffs Jose Felix Del Cid Parras, Felix Joe Del Cid, and Marylinn Del Cid filed a complaint against Defendants LA Specialty Produce and Jose M. Vences alleging negligence, negligence per se, and statutory liability in the complaint arising from an automobile collision that occurred on October 9, 2015.

On August 13, 2020, Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid.

On December 1, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras petition to December 9, 2020.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is scheduled for March 19, 2021.

PARTYS REQUEST

Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimant’s attendance are not required due to Claimant’s age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

On December 1, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parraspetition to December 9, 2020 so Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras could file amended petitioning papers amending the request for attorney’s fees.  Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras has not filed amended petitioning papers.  As such, the Court finds the petition must be denied.

CONCLUSION

The petition is DENIED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

Case Number: BC677681    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. No opposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On September 27, 2017, Plaintiffs Jose Felix Del Cid Parras, Felix Joe Del Cid, and Marylinn Del Cid filed a complaint against Defendants LA Specialty Produce and Jose M. Vences alleging negligence, negligence per se, and statutory liability in the complaint arising from an automobile collision that occurred on October 9, 2015.

On August 13, 2020, Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is scheduled for March 19, 2021.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Petitioner Jose Felix Del Cid Parras (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Marylinn Juanita Del Cid (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition. However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimant’s attendance are not required due to Claimant’s age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petition cannot be approved. The requested $15,750.00, or fourty five percent of the gross settlement, in attorney’s fees is unreasonable. Six depositions were either taken or defended, written discovery was engaged in, and mediation was prepared for. There is an estimated 100 hours worked on this case. This is sufficient to justify thirty-three percent of the gross settlement in attorney’s fees, but not nearly half of Claimant’s gross settlement.

CONCLUSION

The petition is DENIED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.A. SPECIALTY PRODUCE , CO is a litigant