This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 02:26:22 (UTC).

JOSE F. GUTIERREZ ANAYA AKA FRANK GUTIERREZ REVOCABLE TRUST OF 2022

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 JOSE F GUTIERREZ ANAYA AKA FRANK GUTIERREZ REVOCABLE TRUST OF 2022 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3128

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GASCA JUAN

Other

GUTIERREZ JOSE F.

Not Classified By Court

JOSE F. GUTIERREZ ANAYA AKA FRANK GUTIERREZ REVOCABLE TRUST OF 2022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BAYLEY GUY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for an order to confirm validity of trust etc

3/29/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for an order to confirm validity of trust etc

Notice - Hearing

4/1/2022: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

6/7/2022: Notice - Hearing

Request - Continuance (1st Request)

6/2/2022: Request - Continuance (1st Request)

Supplement - Supplement- Second verified

6/15/2022: Supplement - Supplement- Second verified

Supplement - Supplement- First Verified- Note G only

6/10/2022: Supplement - Supplement- First Verified- Note G only

Request - Continuance (Granted)

6/30/2022: Request - Continuance (Granted)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketRequest - Continuance (Granted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement- Second verified ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement- First Verified- Note G only ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRequest - Continuance (1st Request); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for an order to confirm validity of trust etc ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD