This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:45:06 (UTC).

JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL VS AMERICAN PACIFIC FORWARDERS INC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN PACIFIC FORWARDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4059

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL

GABRIEL JOSE DOMINGO

Defendants

AMERICAN PACIFIC FOARWARDERS INC(APPEALAN

AMERICAN PACIFIC FOARWARDERS INCAPPEALAN

JR SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT ETCC MCNATT

Others

STATE LABOR OCMMISSIONER (NAMI CHUN)

STATE LABOR OCMMISSIONER NAMI CHUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HIRSCH LAW FIRM (DORINNA HIRSCH )

FIRM SLATTERY LAW

Defendant Attorney

SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT ETC(C MCNATT JR)

 

Court Documents

Order

10/11/2017: Order

Undertaking

10/11/2017: Undertaking

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/11/2017: Complaint

Minute Order

12/7/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/26/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

3/7/2018: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application

9/26/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Related Case

9/26/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

10/19/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/19/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

11/21/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

12/19/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

12/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReWhy Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Attorney for Failure to Appear at Today's Hearing) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by AMERICAN PACIFIC FOARWARDERS INC(APPEALAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, S...) of 12/19/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 08:18 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/21/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice; Filed by SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT ETC(C MCNATT JR) (Legacy Party); AMERICAN PACIFIC FOARWARDERS INC(APPEALAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • at 11:00 AM in Department S27; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to Diff. Department) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT ETC(C MCNATT JR) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Order (To Show Cause Hearing); Filed by JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Undertaking; Filed by SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT ETC(C MCNATT JR) (Legacy Party); AMERICAN PACIFIC FOARWARDERS INC(APPEALAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JOSE DOMINGO GABRIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less