This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 12:52:09 (UTC).

JOSE DIAZ VS VARDITER KETCHETCHIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 JOSE DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VARDITER KETCHETCHIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6171

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ JOSE

Defendants

AYVAZYAN ARAM

AYVAZYAN ARMEN

KETCHETCHIAN VARDITER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

GRANDY JAMES LAWTON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/7/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/3/2022: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2024
  • Hearing12/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Varditer Ketchetchian (Defendant); Armen Ayvazyan (Defendant); Aram Ayvazyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Varditer Ketchetchian (Defendant); Armen Ayvazyan (Defendant); Aram Ayvazyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E