This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 17:58:07 (UTC).

JOSE DE MARCOS VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JOSE DE MARCOS filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3979

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE MARCOS JOSE AKA JOSE DEMARCOS

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

2/23/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/29/2023: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/1/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/17/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for CAMERON MAJOR (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: CAMERON MAJOR (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: CAMERON MAJOR (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketAddress for CAMERON MAJOR (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Jose De Marcos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jose De Marcos (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE DE MARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE DE MARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSE DE MARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JOSE DE MARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less