This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 10:50:31 (UTC).

JOSE DANIEL VITAL, ET AL. VS FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 JOSE DANIEL VITAL, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1611

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGUIANO LIMON SONIA LIZBETH

MENDOZA LUCILA LIMON

TORREZ ANGUIANO ANGEL RICARDO

VITAL JOSE DANIEL

Defendants

FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC.

ROMERO EMILIO PULIDO

YTURRALDE KENNETH LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEECHER BRIAN G.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

1/25/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

1/25/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JOSE DANIEL VITAL, et al. on 01/25/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by JOSE DANIEL VITAL, LUCILA LIMON MENDOZA, SONIA LIZBETH ANGUIANO LIMON, BRIANNA CAMILA TORREZ ANGUIANO, ANGEL RICARDO TORREZ ANGUIANO, and KENDRA NICOLE TORREZ ANGUIANO as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JOSE DANIEL VITAL (Plaintiff); LUCILA LIMON MENDOZA (Plaintiff); SONIA LIZBETH ANGUIANO LIMON (Plaintiff); BRIANNA CAMILA TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANGEL RICARDO TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); KENDRA NICOLE TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC. (Defendant); KENNETH LEE YTURRALDE (Defendant); EMILIO PULIDO ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE DANIEL VITAL (Plaintiff); LUCILA LIMON MENDOZA (Plaintiff); SONIA LIZBETH ANGUIANO LIMON (Plaintiff); BRIANNA CAMILA TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANGEL RICARDO TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); KENDRA NICOLE TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC. (Defendant); KENNETH LEE YTURRALDE (Defendant); EMILIO PULIDO ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE DANIEL VITAL (Plaintiff); LUCILA LIMON MENDOZA (Plaintiff); SONIA LIZBETH ANGUIANO LIMON (Plaintiff); BRIANNA CAMILA TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANGEL RICARDO TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); KENDRA NICOLE TORREZ ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: FAITH UTILITY INSTALLATION INC. (Defendant); KENNETH LEE YTURRALDE (Defendant); EMILIO PULIDO ROMERO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less