This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2022 at 05:29:11 (UTC).

JOSE D. MOLINA, TRUSTEE OF THE MOLINA TRUST DATED MARCH 16, 2021, ET AL. VS CARLOS A. GALDAMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 JOSE D MOLINA, TRUSTEE OF THE MOLINA TRUST DATED MARCH 16, 2021 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARLOS A GALDAMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5993

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLINA TRUSTEE OF THE MOLINA TRUST

Defendants

GALDAMEZ CARLOS A.

GALDAMEZ GRACIELA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. A UNITED STATES CORPORATION

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ. RICHARD E.

Defendant Attorney

BARTH JASON EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 AND DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE; [PROPOSED] ORD

1/24/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 AND DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE; [PROPOSED] ORD

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

1/5/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 01/05/2022

1/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 01/05/2022

Notice of Ruling

1/6/2022: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

11/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/26/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

9/27/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP. TO CONTINUE TIME TO RESPOND

9/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP. TO CONTINUE TIME TO RESPOND

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/20/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

7/23/2021: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation for Retention of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 and Dismissal of Entire Action, with Prejudice; [Proposed] Order Thereon); Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Enter Default as to defendant, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.,) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 24; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case;) of 01/05/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement ((Conditional)); Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose D. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff); Rosa A. Molina, Trustee of the Molina Trust Dated March 16, 2021 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Molina Healthcare Of Fla Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMSON RICHARD E.