Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2020 at 02:36:57 (UTC).

JOSE CERVANTES VS PAK FAMILY CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 JOSE CERVANTES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PAK FAMILY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD, BARBARA M. SCHEPER and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1373

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CERVANTES JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

PAK CHOL S.

PAK CHOL H

DOES 1 TO 10

PAK YONG C.

PAK FAMILY CORPORATION

PAK CHOL H.

Other

LEE MAXIMILIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TOOBI JUSTIN ESQ

LEE MAXIMILIAN

TOOBI JUSTIN

Defendant, Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

WOO THERESA ESQ.

TOOBI JUSTIN ESQ

WOO THERESA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WOO THERESA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT SUMMARY OF RESPONSES TO [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTESS MOTION FOR POST- JUDGMENT COSTS AND FEES AGAINST DEFENDANTS PAK FAMILY CORPORATION AND CHOL HYON PAK

11/13/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT SUMMARY OF RESPONSES TO [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTESS MOTION FOR POST- JUDGMENT COSTS AND FEES AGAINST DEFENDANTS PAK FAMILY CORPORATION AND CHOL HYON PAK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

RETURNED MAIL

10/22/2019: RETURNED MAIL

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTES'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

10/1/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTES'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Motion for Attorney Fees

9/23/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

4/4/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discover...)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discover...)

Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 5 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Plaintiff From Introducing Any Evidence of Medical Records Not Disclosed

12/28/2018: Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 5 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Plaintiff From Introducing Any Evidence of Medical Records Not Disclosed

Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No.2 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No.2 To Exclude Plaintiff from Introducing Any Evidence of Changes to Employment Practices

12/28/2018: Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No.2 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No.2 To Exclude Plaintiff from Introducing Any Evidence of Changes to Employment Practices

Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 8 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No. 8 To Admit Evidence of Defense Concession And Tender of Maximum Statutory Penalty on

12/31/2018: Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 8 Defendants Pak Family Corporation and Chol H. Pak's Motion in Limine No. 8 To Admit Evidence of Defense Concession And Tender of Maximum Statutory Penalty on

Declaration - Declaration of Theresa Woo, esq. RE FSC Trial Document Submissions

1/3/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Theresa Woo, esq. RE FSC Trial Document Submissions

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

8/7/2018: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

SUMMONS -

10/26/2017: SUMMONS -

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions); Filed by Pak Family Corporation (Defendant); Chol H. Pak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTES?S MOTION FOR POST- JUDGMENT COSTS AND FEES AGAINST DEFENDANTS PAK FAMILY CORPORATION AND CHOL HYON PAK); Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (SUMMARY OF RESPONSES TO [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOSE CERVANTES?S MOTION FOR POST- JUDGMENT COSTS AND FEES AGAINST DEFENDANTS PAK FAMILY CORPORATION AND CHOL HYON PAK); Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Plaintiff's Post-Judgment Costs and Fees); Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES DUE, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC681373    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Moving Party: Justin Toobi & Maximilian Lee, counsel for Jose Cervantes

Resp. Party: None

The motion to be relieved as counsel is GRANTED.

BACKGROUND:

Plaintiff Jose Cervantes filed this action on October 26, 2017. The operative second amended complaint asserts causes of action for (1) Failure to Pay Wages; (2) Failure to Pay Minimum Wage; (3) Failure to Pay Overtime; (4) Failure to Provide Meal and Rest Breaks; (5) Failure to Furnish Wage Statements; (6) Unfair Competition; (7) Waiting Time Penalties; (8) Retaliation; (9) Wrongful Termination; (10) Discrimination Disability; (11) Failure to Accommodate; (12) Failure to Engage in Interactive Process; and (13) Disability Harassment.

On March 8, 2019, Judgment was entered in this matter.

On April 6, 2020, Justin Toobi & Maximilian Lee, counsel for Plaintiff, filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel.

ANALYSIS:

An attorney moving to be relieved as counsel under California Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) must meet the requirements set out in California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362. To comply with rule 3.1362, the moving party must submit the following forms: (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; (2) Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; and (3) Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(a), (c), (e).) The moving party must serve the aforementioned forms on the client and all other parties who have appeared in the case. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).) Further, when the client is served by mail, the attorney's declaration must show that the client's address was confirmed within the last 30 days and how it was confirmed. (Id.) Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)

Counsel’s motion complies with all of the requirements of California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362, in that Counsel provided a notice of motion and motion to be relieved as counsel; order granting attorneys’ motion to be relieved as counsel; and declaration in support of the motions to be relieved as counsel. Additionally, Counsel’s client was notified by mailing the motion and supporting documents to his last known address and by telephone. (See Declaration, Nos. 3(a), 3(b)(2)(b).) Counsel also filed a proof of service demonstrating that they served all other parties who have appeared in the case. This motion has also not been opposed by any party to the case.

The motion to be relieved as counsel is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOOBI JUSTIN