This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2022 at 22:51:59 (UTC).

JOSE CERA VS NONA HATYAN

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 JOSE CERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NONA HATYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5002

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERA JOSE

Defendant

HATYAN NONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARMER JERLISIA

Defendant Attorney

COLLINSON LISA DAWN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/9/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

2/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/14/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Demand for Jury Trial

6/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/15/2022: Answer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2025
  • Hearing02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nona Hatyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nona Hatyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Cera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Cera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Cera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Cera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINSON LISA D. ESQ.