This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 22:00:25 (UTC).

JOSE ARTURO ARIAS ORDONEZ VS 8553 SEPULVEDA BLVD., LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 JOSE ARTURO ARIAS ORDONEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 8553 SEPULVEDA BLVD , LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6004

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIAS ORDONEZ JOSE ARTURO

Defendants

MEHTA ANIL

J.K RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC.

8553 SEPULVEDA BLVD. LLC

J.K. PROPERTIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E

Defendant Attorney

LEE CLAYTON TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

7/14/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND/OR CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF

7/15/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND/OR CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, JORGE ARTURO ARIAS ORDONEZ...)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, JORGE ARTURO ARIAS ORDONEZ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTI...)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTI...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

8/12/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTI...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING OF PLAINTI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

8/18/2021: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/19/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONT. TRIAL

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONT. TRIAL

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY AND/OR EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY AND/OR EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO SHOW DEFENDANT ALL POWERPOINTS, PHOTOGRAPHS, BLOW-UPS AND EXHIBITS BEFORE SHOWING THEM TO THE JURY; MEMORANUM OF POINTS

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO SHOW DEFENDANT ALL POWERPOINTS, PHOTOGRAPHS, BLOW-UPS AND EXHIBITS BEFORE SHOWING THEM TO THE JURY; MEMORANUM OF POINTS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 RE EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS THAT DEFENDANTS VIOLATED ANY STATUTES OR REGULATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P.

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 RE EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS THAT DEFENDANTS VIOLATED ANY STATUTES OR REGULATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P.

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 RE EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE FOR ALL HABITABILITY CLAIMS PRIOR TO FEBRUARY 14, 2019; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 RE EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE FOR ALL HABITABILITY CLAIMS PRIOR TO FEBRUARY 14, 2019; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ANY AND ALL GOLDEN RULE AND REPTILE THEORY COMMENTARY, ARGUMENT, TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE; MEMORANUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWAR

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ANY AND ALL GOLDEN RULE AND REPTILE THEORY COMMENTARY, ARGUMENT, TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE; MEMORANUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWAR

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE ANY MENTIONING OF DOLLAR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE; MEMORANUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

9/7/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE ANY MENTIONING OF DOLLAR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE; MEMORANUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD P. BRODY

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel SRs from Defendant JK Residential Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel SRs from Defendants JK Properties, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel PODs from Defendant JK Residential Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel SRs from Defendant Anil Mehta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel PODs from Defendant JK Properties, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel PODs from Defendant Anil Mehta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel SRs from Defendants 8553 Sepulveda Blvd., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel PODs from Defendant 8553 Sepulveda Blvd., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Arturo Arias Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8553 SEPULVEDA BLVD. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTERLBANCO ERIC E ESQ.