This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 04:31:16 (UTC).

JOSE ARMANDO CRUZ VS PACIFIC 9 TRANSPORTATION INC. A TRUCKING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 JOSE ARMANDO CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PACIFIC 9 TRANSPORTATION INC A TRUCKING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3161

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ JOSE ARMANDO

Defendants

PACIFIC 9 TRANSPORTATION INC. A TRUCKING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

XUAN MAI TRUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONG MIA HYANG

Defendant Attorney

KRAMER JEFFREY STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/20/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/20/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/20/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/20/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/6/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2025
  • Hearing04/16/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pacific 9 Transportation Inc. a Trucking Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Mai Trung Xuan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pacific 9 Transportation Inc. a Trucking Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); Mai Trung Xuan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Armando Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC 9 TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMER JEFFREY S. ESQ.