This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:57:52 (UTC).

JOSE AQUINO VS REMNANT AND OUTCASTS CHURCH OF CHRIST

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 JOSE AQUINO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REMNANT AND OUTCASTS CHURCH OF CHRIST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9409

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AQUINO JOSE

MASTERS MANAGEMENT

Defendant

REMNANT AND OUTCASRS CHURCH OF CHRIST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASMUSSEN DENNIS LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Judgment

5/20/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment; Filed by REMNANT AND OUTCASRS CHURCH OF CHRIST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment-Default; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketDismissal of Does; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment-Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party); JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party); JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party); JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party); JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party); JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MASTERS MANAGEMENT (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE AQUINO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9409    Hearing Date: March 12, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiff Jose Aquino’s dba Masters Management (“Plaintiff”) applications for default judgment against Defendants Fujiko Suzuki, Yashushi Tamura, and Reiko Tamura (“Defendants”) are DENIED with prejudice for the following reasons:

On January 4, 2018, Plaintiff dismissed “with prejudice” the Defendants named in the complaint as Does 1-100. Therefore, the subsequent amendments to the Complaint on August 28, 2019 of the above-referenced Defendants were invalid.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REMNANT AND OUTCASTS CHURCH OF CHRIST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASMUSSEN, DENNIS