Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 12:24:45 (UTC).

JOSE ANTONIO MURILLO ORTIZ VS RAMNIEL BERNARDO

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 JOSE ANTONIO MURILLO ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMNIEL BERNARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8218

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURILLO ORTIZ JOSE ANTONIO

Defendant

BERNARDO RAMNIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

NAIM RYAN

Defendant Attorney

LEE CANDACE B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE ALL REFERENCES TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

1/29/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE ALL REFERENCES TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

10/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

10/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/27/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/6/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Strike all References to Punitive Damages from Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages for Personal Injury); Filed by Ramniel Bernardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ramniel Bernardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ramniel Bernardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Antonio Murillo Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE CANDACE