Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 09:25:05 (UTC).

JOSE ALVARENGA, ET AL. VS JOSEPH CONNARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 JOSE ALVARENGA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEPH CONNARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1016

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MARTINEZ JUAN

ALVARENGA JOSE

SAAVEDRA KIMBERLY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ESSITY NORTH AMERICA INC.

CONNARD JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY STEVEN ELLIOT

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHRISTINA F.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/7/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/13/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/3/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/3/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

6/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/1/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Essity North America, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Joseph Connard (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Alvarenga (Plaintiff); Juan Martinez (Plaintiff); Kimberly Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Essity North America, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Joseph Connard (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Essity North America, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Joseph Connard (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Essity North America, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Joseph Connard (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joseph Connard (Defendant); Essity North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joseph Connard (Defendant); Essity North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Joseph Connard (Defendant); Essity North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Joseph Connard (Defendant); Essity North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Joseph Connard (Defendant); Essity North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jose Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Alvarenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Alvarenga (Plaintiff); Juan Martinez (Plaintiff); Kimberly Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Alvarenga (Plaintiff); Juan Martinez (Plaintiff); Kimberly Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL CHRISTINA FERRERI