This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 13:39:22 (UTC).

JOSE ALFREDO MENDOZA - LOMBERA, ET AL. VS MICHAEL ALEXANDER LEYVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On September 14, 2021, Jose Alfredo Mendoza Lombera and Alba Guadalupe Mendoza Torres (hereinafter "Plaintiffs"), represented by Rafii Daniel Jacob, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Michael Alexander Leyva; AJR Trucking INC. (hereinafter "AJR"); Amazon.com, LLC(hereinafter "Amazon LLC"); Amazon.com services, LLC(hereinafter "Amazon Services LLC"); and Amazon.com International Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages along with pre-and post-judgement interest for Defendant’s alleged negligence. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court of California in the Spring Street Courthouse.

In the complaint the Plaintiffs alleged that, “On or about November 27, 2019,at the state route 99 northbound, 750 feet south of Paige Avenue is in Tulare County (hereinafter "Subject Location") the Defendants, and each of them, so negligently owned, entrusted, managed, maintained, drove, and operated Defendants' vehicle so as to cause Defendants' vehicle to collide with the Plaintiffs vehicle, proximately causing those injuries and damages to the Plaintiffs. As a direct and proximate result of the acts and omissions of Defendants, and each of them, Plaintiffs were injured in their health, strength, and activity, sustaining injuries to their bodies and persons, all of which said injuries have caused and continue to cause Plaintiffs great physical and mental pain and suffering. Plaintiffs are informed and believe and thereon allege that these injuries will result in some permanent disability to them.”

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of the acts and omissions of the Defendants, and each of them, and the injuries resulting therefrom, Plaintiffs necessarily employed physicians and surgeons for medical examination, treatment, and care of these injuries, and incurred medical and incidental expenses. Plaintiffs will also have to incur additional like expenses in the future, all in amounts presently unknown to them.”

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of the acts and omissions of the Defendants, and each of them, and the injuries resulting therefrom, Plaintiffs have been unable to cany out their usual occupation and will thereby suffer damages by reason of loss of income; that the exact and reasonable amount of said loss of income is unknown to Plaintiffs, who will ask leave of the court either to show the amount of Plaintiffs' lost earnings, when ascertained, or to prove that amount at trial.”

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs which deals with alleged negligence against all Defendants.

In their prayer for relief the Plaintiffs have requested the Court for economic damages, including lost wages, lost employee benefits, medical expenses and other economic obligations incurred according to proof at trial; for non-economic damages, including physical pain and suffering, loss of enjoyment of life and anxiety associated with their injuries; for pre- and post-judgment interest at the maximum legal rate; and for costs for the suit along with such other relief that the ourt may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4026

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENDOZA - LOMBERA JOSE ALFREDO

MENDOZA ALBA GUADELUPE TORRES

Defendants

AJR TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LEYVA MICHAEL ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFII DANIEL JACOB

Defendant Attorney

DANISHWAR MARYAM

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

8/26/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AJR Trucking, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jose Alfredo Mendoza - Lombera (Plaintiff); Alba Guadelupe Mendoza, Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: AJR Trucking, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Alfredo Mendoza - Lombera (Plaintiff); Alba Guadelupe Mendoza, Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Alexander Leyva (Defendant); AJR Trucking, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Amazon.com, LLC a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Alfredo Mendoza - Lombera (Plaintiff); Alba Guadelupe Mendoza, Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Alexander Leyva (Defendant); AJR Trucking, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Amazon.com, LLC a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Alfredo Mendoza - Lombera (Plaintiff); Alba Guadelupe Mendoza, Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Alexander Leyva (Defendant); AJR Trucking, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Amazon.com, LLC a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AJR TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant