This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 00:29:02 (UTC).

JOSE ALBERT HILARIO HERNANDEZ VS CITY OF TORRANCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 JOSE ALBERT HILARIO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1593

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ JOSE ALBERT HILARIO

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

DOES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIRNIA ARDY

Defendant Attorney

SARIGUMBA JOCELYN NECHALDAS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

12/23/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/30/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/3/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Torrance (Defendant); As to: Jose Albert Hilario Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jose Albert Hilario Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Service Date: 01/05/2023; Service Cost: 162.41; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed by: Jose Albert Hilario Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Albert Hilario Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Albert Hilario Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less