This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 04:04:34 (UTC).

JOSE ALARCON VS AFNI, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 JOSE ALARCON filed an Other lawsuit against AFNI, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9646

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALARCON JOSE

Defendants

AFNI INC

SPRINT CORPORATION

T-MOBILE USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMAS ANDREI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jose Alarcon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jose Alarcon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Alarcon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFNI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sprint Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARMAS ANDREI