Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 00:33:11 (UTC).

JORGEN DE MEY ET AL VS JAMES MICHAEL HURLEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 JORGEN DE MEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES MICHAEL HURLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1093

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DE MEY JORGEN

DE MEY VINCENT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 40

WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

HURLEY JAMES MICHAEL

CONSTRUCTORS WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR

WALSH CONSTRUCTION

J.F. SHEA CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PHEFFER JEFFREY I. ESQ.

SOOFER RAMIN

SOOFER RAMIN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GONZALEZ ERIN

GONZALEZ ERIN ROSE ESQ.

PARTOS MICHAEL JONATHAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE; COVID-19;)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE; COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE; COVID-19;) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE; COVID-19;) OF 04/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Ruling

10/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

10/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

10/10/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL...)

10/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL...)

Answer

10/4/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

6/21/2019: Answer

Answer

5/17/2019: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

5/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

SUMMONS -

6/21/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/21/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff); Vincent De Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re; COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re; COVID-19;) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by James Michael Hurley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff); Vincent De Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorgen DE Mey (Plaintiff); Vincent De Mey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTORS WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS A BUSINESS OF FORM UNKNOWN; is a litigant

Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CO. INC. AS NOMINEE 1996-1 A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant