This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2022 at 19:27:37 (UTC).

JORGE VICENTE, VS STK WESTWOOD, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 JORGE VICENTE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STK WESTWOOD, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8725

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICENTE JORGE

Defendants

STK REBEL SAN DIEGO LLC

STK ROOFTOP SAN DIEGO LLC

STK WESTWOOD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEDINA IVAN P.

NOURMAND MICHAEL

DE SARIO JAMES A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/7/2022: Complaint

Initial Status Conference Order

6/9/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/09/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/09/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK ROOFTOP SAN DIEGO, LLC)

6/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK ROOFTOP SAN DIEGO, LLC)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK REBEL SAN DIEGO, LLC)

6/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK REBEL SAN DIEGO, LLC)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK WESTWOOD, LLC)

6/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (STK WESTWOOD, LLC)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons (STK Westwood, LLC)); Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons (STK Rebel San Diego, LLC)); Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons (STK Rooftop San Diego, LLC)); Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 2:25 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/09/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Vicente, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STK WESTWOOD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA IVAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.