Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 04:58:20 (UTC).

JORGE SANDOVAL VS WALSH/SHEA CONSTRUCTORS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 JORGE SANDOVAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WALSH/SHEA CONSTRUCTORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4123

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL JORGE

Defendants

WALSH CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY II LLC

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

WALSH/SHEA CONSTRUCTORS

WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

Defendant Attorney

CARTER KIMBERLY C.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER

5/10/2021: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/12/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

3/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/30/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • Hearing06/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Amended answer); Filed by WALSH/SHEA Corridor Constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WALSH/SHEA Corridor Constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jorge Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant