This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 06:42:57 (UTC).

JORGE SANDOVAL, JR. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 JORGE SANDOVAL, JR filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6869

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL JORGE JR.

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD CAREY B.

Defendant Attorney

MACLEAR AMY PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); As to: Jorge Sandoval, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Jorge Sandoval, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge Sandoval, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Sandoval, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge Sandoval, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD CAREY B.