This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 05:40:41 (UTC).

JORGE RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS RICBERAY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 JORGE RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RICBERAY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9044

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ REBECA

RODRIGUEZ JORGE

Defendants

RICBERAY INC.

ESPINOZA KIMBERLY

ESPINOZA RICARDO

RICBERAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANEY STEVEN H.

Defendant Attorneys

WOOG PHIL

BEAM GREGORY BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/20/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/14/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

9/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

9/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/6/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/10/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/10/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41(A)(3) AND 435.5(A)(3) AND IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

8/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41(A)(3) AND 435.5(A)(3) AND IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE FO...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE FO...)

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF JORGE RODRIGUEZ, KENNETH W. BAISCH AND THANH PHAM

5/26/2021: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF JORGE RODRIGUEZ, KENNETH W. BAISCH AND THANH PHAM

Request for Judicial Notice

5/26/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

5/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' AMENDED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

5/26/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' AMENDED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

5/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ricberay, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer); Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Strike); Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gregory Bruce Beam (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Ricberay, Inc. (Defendant); Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant); Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Gregory B. Beam re: Compliance with CCP 430.41(a)(3) and 435.5(a)(3) and in support of demurrers and motion to strike); Filed by Ricberay, Inc. (Defendant); Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant); Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOpposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED); Filed by Ricberay, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant); Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Ricberay, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant); Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED); Filed by Ricberay, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Kimberly Espinoza (Defendant); Ricardo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Show Cause For Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rebeca Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICBERAY INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAM GREGORY BRUCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOG PHIL