This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2020 at 10:02:14 (UTC).

JORGE MERAZ VS MICHAEL J ORTIZ II

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 JORGE MERAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL J ORTIZ II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, SAMANTHA JESSNER, EDWARD B. MORETON and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0075

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

SAMANTHA JESSNER

EDWARD B. MORETON

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MERAZ JORGE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

ORTIZ MICHAEL J. II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RAHMANI NEAMA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KOWALSKI MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

6/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE WAGE LOSS AND LOSS OF EARNING CAPACITY FROM THE COMPLAINT

2/20/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE WAGE LOSS AND LOSS OF EARNING CAPACITY FROM THE COMPLAINT

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/14/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

1/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Notice of Ruling

12/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF H. DEAN AYNECHI; EXHIBITS

12/13/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF H. DEAN AYNECHI; EXHIBITS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/4/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GM ISO MOTION TO COMPEL

12/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GM ISO MOTION TO COMPEL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARQUEZ ISO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARQUEZ ISO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARQUEZ ISO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - FORM INTERROGS

12/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MARQUEZ ISO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - FORM INTERROGS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/9/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Separate Statement

12/9/2019: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

12/9/2019: Separate Statement

Demand for Jury Trial

8/28/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/28/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/28/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/29/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Hearing03/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Michael J. II Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Jorge Meraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael J. II Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael J. II Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Michael J. II Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Meraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Jorge Meraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Meraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700075    Hearing Date: January 02, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S DEPOSITION

On March 29, 2018, plaintiff Jorge Meraz filed this action against defendant Michael Ortiz II. Plaintiff served Defendant with the complaint on August 7, 2019. On October 25, 2019, Defendant noticed Plaintiff’s deposition for November 12, 2019. Plaintiff served objections on November 1, 2019 on grounds of unavailability. On November 6, 2019, defense counsel set a meet and confer letter to Plaintiff’s counsel asking for dates. On November 11, Plaintiff’s counsel spoke with someone at defense counsel’s office about dates. On November 18, Plaintiff’s counsel left a message with defense counsel about the deposition. Defense counsel sent another letter on November 18, 2019. Plaintiff’s counsel sent an email with dates on November 27, 2019. Defendant filed this motion on December 4, 2019. The parties have now set the deposition for February 13, 2020, and Defendant withdrew the request for sanctions. Accordingly, this motion is MOOT.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.