This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2023 at 01:10:43 (UTC).

JORGE MEDINA VS MARIA ALICIA FREEMAN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 JORGE MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA ALICIA FREEMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1597

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA JORGE

Defendant

FREEMAN MARIA ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEHME ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ DAVID

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/27/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/27/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/27/2022: Complaint

Answer

12/1/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2024
  • Hearing03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maria Alicia Freeman (Defendant); As to: Jorge Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Maria Alicia Freeman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Alicia Freeman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Alicia Freeman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Alicia Freeman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEHME ANTHONY