This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 05:22:18 (UTC).

JORGE GUTIERREZ VS BRUNDAGE-BONE CONCRETE PUMPING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 JORGE GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRUNDAGE-BONE CONCRETE PUMPING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8741

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ JORGE

Defendants

BRUNDAGE-BONE CONCRETE PUMPING INC.

JLS CONCRETE PUMPING INC.

SWINERTON BUILDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCANN SHAWN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

NEWCOMB MARK D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES

5/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES

Answer

5/31/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2025
  • Hearing03/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BRUNDAGE-BONE CONCRETE PUMPING, INC DBA JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. Erroneously Sued As Brundage-Bone Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Defendant); JLS Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES); Filed by BRUNDAGE-BONE CONCRETE PUMPING, INC DBA JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. Erroneously Sued As Brundage-Bone Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Defendant); JLS Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jorge Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JLS Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCANN, SHAWN J.