This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 08:44:32 (UTC).

JORGE GOMEZ VS CHARLES ALLEN LESSER

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 JORGE GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHARLES ALLEN LESSER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5865

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GOMEZ JORGE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

LESSER CHARLES ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DE VORE MICHAEL J. ESQ.

DEVORE MICHAEL JOSEPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

5/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

5/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jorge Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jorge Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE VORE MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVORE MICHAEL JOSEPH