This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 06:37:31 (UTC).

JORGE FLORES VS LGI ASSOCIATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 JORGE FLORES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LGI ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8799

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FLORES JORGE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LGI ASSOCIATION INC.

CHIU JOHN C.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

KARANDISH SAEID

YOUABIAN SHARONA

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

CHIU JOHN C.

PJCF-T2 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHONEY LAW GROUP APC

ALIAZIS DIONISIOS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

CAWLFIELD CRAIG OWEN

SCHULTE YVONNE MARIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/15/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC.

4/20/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

CONSOLIDATED IN PART WITH BC668796,BC668985, BC668798, BC668987, BC668797, BC668799, BC668986, BC669077, BC669050 AND BC669049] CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/11/2018: CONSOLIDATED IN PART WITH BC668796,BC668985, BC668798, BC668987, BC668797, BC668799, BC668986, BC669077, BC669050 AND BC669049] CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Unknown

7/13/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION, INC., SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA VOL ABIAN FOR:

7/13/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION, INC., SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA VOL ABIAN FOR:

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/19/2018: Unknown

NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES

7/26/2018: NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 4:03 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jorge Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jorge Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PJCF-T2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LGI ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALIAZIS DIONISIOS