This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 02:22:17 (UTC).

JORGE DE LA GARZA VS G.D. BACA, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/02/2018 JORGE DE LA GARZA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against G D BACA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8968

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA GARZA JORGE

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

G.D. BACA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BACA GARY D.

COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING

CUAHUTEMOCPENA VICTOR

VIC'S RESTORATION & CONSTRUCTION

ADJUSTING COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC

CUAHUTEMOC PENA VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL R. SOHIGIAN

SOHIGIAN MICHAEL RYAN

Defendant Attorneys

BUILDERS LAW GROUP INC.

CAMPBELL NICHELO MICHAEL

SOFRIS MICHAEL NOEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE

3/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING OF TRIAL SETTING ...)

5/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING OF TRIAL SETTING ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/6/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Related Case

5/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - OF RESCHEDULED HEARING

9/20/2018: Notice - OF RESCHEDULED HEARING

Case Management Statement

11/21/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service -

9/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

9/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

Answer - TO THE COMPLAINT

9/13/2018: Answer - TO THE COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference -

7/2/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference -

Complaint -

7/2/2018: Complaint -

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 11:22 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation re Trial Continuance)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation re Trial Continuance) of 03/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re Trial Continuance); Filed by Jorge De La Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Jorge De La Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Jorge De La Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.D. BACA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VIC'S RESTORATION AND CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOHIGIAN MICHAEL