This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 23:37:05 (UTC).

JORGE CAIMI VS WHILLS, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 JORGE CAIMI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WHILLS, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5289

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAIMI JORGE

Defendants

WHILLS LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FAIRWINDS-WEST HILLS

RAMIREZ JOSE BRUNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Hearing03/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jorge Caimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jorge Caimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jorge Caimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jorge Caimi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less