This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 01:01:51 (UTC).

JORGE ALVAREZ HERNANDEZ VS HYDROFORM USA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 JORGE ALVAREZ HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HYDROFORM USA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8015

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ HERNANDEZ JORGE

Defendant

HYDROFORM USA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorney

CATO CHRISTOPHER B.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/6/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HYDROFORM USAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/23/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HYDROFORM USAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/8/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: A. Jacob Nalbandyan (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketAddress for A. Jacob Nalbandyan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANT HYDROFORM USAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Hydroform USA, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Hydroform USA, a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/13/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Hydroform USA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Hydroform USA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Alvarez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Hydroform USA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less