This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2023 at 16:01:43 (UTC).

JORGE A. RIVERA VS SHILPARK PAINT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 JORGE A RIVERA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHILPARK PAINT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1908

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA JORGE A.

Defendants

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

SHILPARK PAINT CORPORATION

SHILPARK STUDIO PAINT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOGAN NIKOLAY

Defendant Attorneys

CATO CHRISTOPHER B.

DALBY DAVID I.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

1/23/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

1/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/19/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

11/23/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JORGE A. RIVERAS COMPLAINT

11/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JORGE A. RIVERAS COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

10/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2024
  • Hearing02/16/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 updated: Result Date to 02/03/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Shilpark Paint Corporation (Defendant); Shilpark Studio Paint Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Shilpark Paint Corporation (Defendant); Shilpark Studio Paint Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Barrett Business Services Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Shilpark Paint Corporation, a California corporation; (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2022; Service Cost: 115.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Shilpark Studio Paint Inc. a California corporation; (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Shilpark Paint Corporation, a California corporation; (Defendant); Shilpark Studio Paint Inc. a California corporation; (Defendant); Barrett Business Services Inc. a Maryland corporation; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge A. Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Shilpark Paint Corporation, a California corporation; (Defendant); Shilpark Studio Paint Inc. a California corporation; (Defendant); Barrett Business Services Inc. a Maryland corporation; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less