This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2022 at 10:50:13 (UTC).

JORDAN PEISNER VS ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/01/2017 JORDAN PEISNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9667

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC

RDR FOODS INC

DOES 1 TO 50

WENDY'S

PLATT PARTNERS LP (DOE 17)

SDL MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC (DOE 16)

ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RDR FOODS INC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

PLATT PARTNERS LP (DOE 2)

SDL MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC (DOE 1)

ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC.

Minor

PEISNER JORDAN

Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litem

PEISNER EDWARD KEITH

Others

J. MYLES

B. CORAL

S. TAYLOR

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Other Attorneys

NELMS ROBERT W. ESQ.

LAW + BRANDMEYER LLP

LAW YUK KWONG

Defendant, Respondent and Other Attorney

LAW + BRANDMEYER LLP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

NELMS ROBERT W.

Minor Attorney

PHILIPS PAUL N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment

9/9/2021: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT))

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT))

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/9/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)) OF 09/09/2021

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)) OF 09/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOU...)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOU...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA E. MIRABELLO, ESQ. RE: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOULD NOT BE VACATED

8/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA E. MIRABELLO, ESQ. RE: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOULD NOT BE VACATED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (RE: ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OS...) OF 07/16/2021

7/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (RE: ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OS...) OF 07/16/2021

Order - ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOULD NOT BE VACATED BECAUSE SHE DOES NOT HAVE A GAL

7/16/2021: Order - ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE DEFAULT AGAINST CORAL B. SHOULD NOT BE VACATED BECAUSE SHE DOES NOT HAVE A GAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (RE: ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OS...)

7/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (RE: ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT; OS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PAUL PHILIPS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING

7/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PAUL PHILIPS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING

Order - Dismissal

7/13/2021: Order - Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (...)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAUL N. PHILIPS IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP HEARING

5/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAUL N. PHILIPS IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP HEARING

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review ((ReEntry of Judgment)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Entry of Judgment))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Entry of Judgment)) of 09/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the default against Coral B. should not be vacated because she does not have a GAL) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the default against Coral B. shou...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Samantha E. Mirabello, Esq. Re: Response to Order to Show Cause Why the Default Against Coral B. Should Not Be Vacated); Filed by Jordan Peisner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 11:32 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
468 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR JORDAN PEISNER GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL OF CAUSES BY JURY 1. CIVIL CONSPIRACY ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR JORDAN PEISNER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****9667 Hearing Date: September 9, 2021 Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING 9/9/2021

****9667 PEISNER V. ICI

The court has reviewed the evidence in support of the default prove-up against defendants Coral Behor and Yossi Behor, including the testimony of the plaintiff given on 5/27/2021. The court receives in evidence the Declaration of Paul Phillips filed 5/24/2021 and the exhibits attached A-J. The court finds that plaintiff has proved by a preponderance all facts necessary to support a judgment in his favor as stated below.

Judgment is in favor of the plaintiff Jordan Peisner and against defendants Coral Behor and Yossi Behor, jointly and severally, as follows:

Non-economic damages in the sum of $666,210

Economic damages in the sum of $133,242

Total damages are $799,452.

Punitive damages are denied for failure to prove evidence of ability to pay. Clerk to enter judgment and give notice.

'


Case Number: ****9667    Hearing Date: October 14, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING 10/14/2020

FOUR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WITNESSES: MYLES JONES, KELLY JONES, CORAL BECHOR, YOSSI BECHOR

MOTIONS TO COMPEL GRANTED, PROPER NOTICE AND SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS

DEPOSITIONS BY ZOOM:

Myles Jones 11/2/20 at 10 a.m.

Kelly Jones 11/3/2020 at 10 a.m.

Coral Bechor 11/4/2020 at 10 a.m.

Yossi Bechor 11/5/2020 at 10 a.m.

Parties and witnesses may stipulate to alternate dates and times.

MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST KELLY JONES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 2020.240 IN THE SUM OF $1,775 (6 HOURS [3 HOURS EACH MOTION] FOR HER AND HER SON PLUS 1 HOUR APPEARANCE AT $245 PER HOUR PLUS $60 FILING FEE) PAYABLE TO CLIENT TRUST ACCOUNT OF BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP 700 N. BRAND BLVD 10TH FLOOR, GLENDALE CA 91203 WITHIN 30 DAYS

MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST YOSSI BECHOR PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 2020.240 IN THE SUM OF $1,775 (6 HOURS [3 HOURS EACH MOTION] FOR HIM AND HIS DAUGHTER PLUS 1 HOUR APPEARANCE AT $245 PER HOUR PLUS $60 FILING FEE) PAYABLE TO CLIENT TRUST ACCOUNT OF BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP 700 N. BRAND BLVD 10TH FLOOR, GLENDALE CA 91203 WITHIN 30 DAYS



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SDL MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC (DOE 16) is a litigant

Latest cases where ICI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RDR FOODS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PLATT MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant