This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 12:02:38 (UTC).

JORDAN MITCHELLE KAREN ET AL VS KRISTIN MARIE CHRISTOPHER ET

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 JORDAN MITCHELLE KAREN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KRISTIN MARIE CHRISTOPHER ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON, SHIRLEY K. WATKINS and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4540

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KAREN JORDAN MITCHELLE

IRWIN ASHLEY ELIZABETH

YOUNG ANDREW

CLARK HEIDI

CLARK DOUGLAS

Defendants and Respondents

CHRISTOPHER KRISTIN MARIE

DOES 1 TO 100

CHRISTOPHER KRISTIN

CHRISTOPHER KRISTIN MARIE AKA KRISTIN CHRISTOPHER

Minors

KAREN LILIAN

IRWIN ALORAH

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

IRWIN ASHLEY ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CASSANDRA GIORGIO

CASSANDRA GIORGIO JR.

RAMSEY HADI EDWARD ESQ.

RAMSEY HADI EDWARD

MORENO GERARDO JR.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON EDOR GODFREY III

RAFTERY KELLY DENYSE

JOHNSON JERRI

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT- PROPOSED ORDER

8/21/2020: Order - ORDER MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT- PROPOSED ORDER

Order - ORDER [TENTATIVE] RULING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL BUSINESS RECORDS

8/10/2020: Order - ORDER [TENTATIVE] RULING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL BUSINESS RECORDS

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

6/24/2020: Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC)

7/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - PROHEALTH ADVANCED IMAGING

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - PROHEALTH ADVANCED IMAGING

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA JORDAN KAREN - ESHAGH EZRA M.D.

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA JORDAN KAREN - ESHAGH EZRA M.D.

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA JORDAN KAREN - MEDICAL IMAGING CENTER OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA JORDAN KAREN - MEDICAL IMAGING CENTER OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - HEIDI CLARK - PROHEALTH ADVANCED IMAGING

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - HEIDI CLARK - PROHEALTH ADVANCED IMAGING

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MMTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MMTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - MAPFRE INSURANCE

6/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MTC COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA - ANDREW YOUNG - MAPFRE INSURANCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/14/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

2/13/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; ORDER)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES; ORDER)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

6/20/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Hearing05/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Hearing12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MTC Compliance with Subpoena - Heidi Clark - Kenneth Winer DC) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MTC Compliance with Subpoena - Heidi Clark - LADWP) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (MTC Compliance with Subpoena - Heidi Clark - ProHealth Advanced Imaging) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to enforce subpoena duces tecum for records re Heidi Clark from Kenneth Winer - by def) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to enforce subpoena duces tecum for records re Heidi Clark from Kaiser Permanente - by def) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to enforce subpoena duces tecum for records re Jordan Karen for Wellness Wave - by def) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Douglas Clark (Plaintiff); Heidi Clark (Plaintiff); Andrew Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jordan Mitchelle Karen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704540    Hearing Date: August 21, 2020    Dept: T

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

KAREN, etc.

Plaintiff,

v.

CHRISTOPHER, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO. BC704540

[TENTATIVE] RULING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL BUSINESS RECORDS

Date: 8/21/20

Dept. T

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] RULING:

ALL MOTIONS ARE DENIED. No proof of personal service of any subpoenas have been filed. Supporting declaration to each motion attaches only page one of two of the deposition subpoena. Page two, which is the proof of service of deposition subpoena, is not provided.