This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2019 at 08:13:29 (UTC).

JORDAN JURCZYK VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 JORDAN JURCZYK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3342

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JURCZYK JORDAN

Defendants

SINGLETARY SEAN

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THALHEIMER BERNARD JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ROHR CAROL ANN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/26/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

Answer - Answer City of Santa Monica's answer to complaint; demand for jury trial

1/16/2019: Answer - Answer City of Santa Monica's answer to complaint; demand for jury trial

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Refund / Order

3/20/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Request for Dismissal

3/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jordan Jurczyk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer (City of Santa Monica's answer to complaint; demand for jury trial); Filed by City of Santa Monica (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jordan Jurczyk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jordan Jurczyk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROHR CAROL ANN