Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 06:11:15 (UTC).

JORDAN DUFFY VS THE PAIN CENTER FOR NATURAL HEALING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 JORDAN DUFFY filed an Other lawsuit against THE PAIN CENTER FOR NATURAL HEALING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1285

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUFFY JORDAN

Defendants

MARINARO THOMAS DC

THE PAIN CENTER FOR NATURAL HEALING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETOYAN MARCUS ARAM

Defendant Attorney

STARK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

7/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/24/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/8/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney); Filed by Thomas Marinaro, DC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thomas Marinaro, DC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Thomas Marinaro, DC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jordan Duffy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jordan Duffy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jordan Duffy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jordan Duffy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jordan Duffy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETOYAN MARCUS ARAM