This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2021 at 11:33:53 (UTC).

JORDAN BENSON VS CORT SAVAGE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 JORDAN BENSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CORT SAVAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5353

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENSON JORDAN

Defendants

SAVAGE CORT

SAVAGE VIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ NESTOR A.

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL G

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/26/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/22/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/6/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cort Savage (Defendant); Via Savage (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jordan Benson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less