This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 07:51:37 (UTC).

JONES, SHANERRA S. VS JONES, KEONA DORRIS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 JONES, SHANERRA S filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JONES, KEONA DORRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0219

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES SHANERRA S.

Respondent

JONES KEONA DORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHAN SABRINA S

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/1/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

3/1/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

3/1/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/1/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Waiver - Hearing on Denied Request Temp. Restraining Order

3/1/2021: Waiver - Hearing on Denied Request Temp. Restraining Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/1/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Minute Order

3/25/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWaiver - Hearing on Denied Request Temp. Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHAN SABRINA S