Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 16:15:08 (UTC).

JONES, DANIEL ALEX - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 JONES, DANIEL ALEX - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0260

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JONES DANIEL

JONES MARK

JONES REED

Not Classified By Court

JONES DANIEL ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRAIG BARBARA JEAN

 

Court Documents

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

3/2/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

3/2/2021: Rejected Proposed Order

Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

3/4/2021: Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code - [mailed certified copy to litigant]

Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

1/12/2021: Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

1/12/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - AMENDED

1/13/2021: Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value - AMENDED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Real Property of Small Value - 13200 PR Code ([mailed certified copy to litigant] ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG BARBARA JEAN