This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 07:25:20 (UTC).

JONES, ANNIE BRETTELL VS TRAVIS, SAMUEL SOLLLMAN

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 JONES, ANNIE BRETTELL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TRAVIS, SAMUEL SOLLLMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROXAS, ADRIAN GIDAYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7040

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROXAS, ADRIAN GIDAYA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES ANNIE BRETTELL

Respondent

TRAVIS SAMUEL SOLLLMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALLERSTEIN MICHAEL AARON

 

Court Documents

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

10/25/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

10/25/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

10/25/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

10/25/2022: Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/o Minor Child New Case Petition (Petitions)

10/25/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/o Minor Child New Case Petition (Petitions)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

10/25/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

10/25/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/25/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

11/10/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligence (Declarations)

11/15/2022: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligence (Declarations)

Minute Order

11/17/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 13 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 13 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 13, Roxas, Adrian Gidaya, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Declaration of Due Diligence (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) (DV w/o Minor Child New Case Petition (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less