Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2021 at 18:32:22 (UTC).

JONATHAN T. KAJI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE BRUCE T. KAJI AND FRANCES M. KAJI 1982 TRUSTS DATED OCTOBER 1, 1982, ET AL. VS JOHN S. TORII, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 JONATHAN T KAJI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE BRUCE T KAJI AND FRANCES M KAJI 1982 TRUSTS DATED OCTOBER 1, 1982 filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JOHN S TORII. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2967

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE BRUCE T. KAJI AND FRANCES M. KAJI 1982 TRUSTS

JONATHAN T. KAJI AS TRUSTEE OF THE BRUCE T. KAJI AND FRANCES M. KAJI 1982 TRUSTS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TORII JOHN S.

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN S. TORII A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN S. TORII

Cross Defendants

MORI & YAMAMOTO

YAMAMOTO ROBERT J

YAMAMOTO ROBERT J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER DAVID BRUCE

Defendant Attorney

HUBERT VANESSA

Cross Defendant Attorney

SPERO ELIANA ARIEL

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

5/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

6/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Case Management Order

4/15/2021: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) COMPLAINT; (2) SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; (3) CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND (4) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON CROSS-DEFENDANT MORI & YAMAMOTO

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) COMPLAINT; (2) SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; (3) CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND (4) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON CROSS-DEFENDANT MORI & YAMAMOTO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) COMPLAINT; (2) SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; (3) CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND (4) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON CROSS-DEFENDANT ROBERT YAMAMOTO

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) COMPLAINT; (2) SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; (3) CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND (4) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON CROSS-DEFENDANT ROBERT YAMAMOTO

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/18/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

2/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JOHN S. TORII AND LAW OFFICE OF JOHN S. TORII, ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MORI & YAMAMOTO AND ROBERT YAMAMOTO

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JOHN S. TORII AND LAW OFFICE OF JOHN S. TORII, ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MORI & YAMAMOTO AND ROBERT YAMAMOTO

Notice of Ruling

4/15/2021: Notice of Ruling

Cross-Complaint

12/17/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by John S. Torii (Defendant); Law Office of John S. Torii, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order ? Confidential Designation Only); Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for failure to file proof of service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer (TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS JOHN S. TORII AND LAW OFFICE OF JOHN S. TORII); Filed by John S. Torii (Defendant); Law Office of John S. Torii, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JONATHAN T. KAJI, as Trustee of the Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff); The Bruce T. Kaji and Frances M. Kaji 1982 Trusts dated October 1, 1982 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less