This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 19:21:29 (UTC).

JONATHAN SEVERN VS. CHUCK BURTZLOFF

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 JONATHAN SEVERN filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against CHUCK BURTZLOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6567

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVERN JONATHAN SHAREHOLDER

Defendants

GABBARD JASON

BURRELL SABIN

BURTZLOFF CHUCK

GOUDIE BRIAN

AMS WEST COAST HOLDING COMPANY INC. A

HUNT CLAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOTTON SAUNDRA K

Defendant Attorneys

GRIFFIN OLIVER D.

HERRON VINCENT HAROLD

KESSLER PETER N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department U; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted-Order signed & filed) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous; Filed by Chuck Burtzloff (Defendant); Sabin Burrell (Defendant); Clay Hunt (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department U; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Motion Pro Hac Vice; Granted-Order signed & filed) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Lodging; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Lodging; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSummons-Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan, Shareholder Severn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less