This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 15:39:25 (UTC).

JONATHAN ROSS VS MSG FORUM, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 JONATHAN ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MSG FORUM, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6571

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSS JONATHAN

Defendants

CAPSS LLC

LIVE NATIONA WORLDWIDE INC.

MSG ENTERTAINMENT INC.

MSG FORUM LLC

MADISON SQUARE GARDEN ENTERTAINMENT CORP.

FORUM ENTERTAINMENT LLC DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

Defendant Attorney

WEISSKOPF STEPHEN D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

5/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

6/24/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/9/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Forum Entertainment LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSG FORUM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL